This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2023 at 11:15:10 (UTC).

FRANCISCO CAMCHO GONZALEZ VS XPO LOGISTICS PORT SERVICES, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 FRANCISCO CAMCHO GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against XPO LOGISTICS PORT SERVICES, LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5013

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMCHO GONZALEZ FRANCISCO

Defendants

DE MORA VILLEGAS BRAULIO A.

GUERRERO LOOR LUIS

GUERRERO TRUCKING AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

XPO LOGISTICS PORT SERVICES LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RABI JUSTIN

ROBERTS CHRISTOPHER K.

Defendant Attorney

GRUPPIE ESQ GUY R

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

8/22/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

3/24/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)

Notice of Ruling

1/31/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order Minute Order (Defendant XPO Logistice Port Services, LLC's Motion to Compel...)

1/27/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Defendant XPO Logistice Port Services, LLC's Motion to Compel...)

Minute Order Minute Order (Defendant XPO Logistics Port Services, LLC's Motion to Compel...)

1/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Defendant XPO Logistics Port Services, LLC's Motion to Compel...)

Reply (name extension) Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

1/18/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Reply (name extension) Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

1/18/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Reply (name extension) Reply TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

1/18/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Opposition (name extension) Opposition To Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Special Interrogatories, Set One; Declaration of Gavin Holland

1/17/2023: Opposition (name extension) Opposition To Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Special Interrogatories, Set One; Declaration of Gavin Holland

Opposition (name extension) Opposition To Defendant's Motion to Compel Request for Production of Documents, Set One; Declaration of Gavin Holland

1/12/2023: Opposition (name extension) Opposition To Defendant's Motion to Compel Request for Production of Documents, Set One; Declaration of Gavin Holland

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Plaintiff's Responses and Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production of

10/28/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Plaintiff's Responses and Production of Documents in Response to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and Request for Monetary Sanctions

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET

10/28/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE) AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS;

Notice (name extension) Notice OF BANKRUPTCY FILING OF DEFENDANT BRAULIO A. DE MORA VILLEGAS AND AUTOMATIC STAY

5/3/2022: Notice (name extension) Notice OF BANKRUPTCY FILING OF DEFENDANT BRAULIO A. DE MORA VILLEGAS AND AUTOMATIC STAY

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

12/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

PI General Order

12/20/2021: PI General Order

Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

12/27/2021: Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

Summons Summons on Complaint

12/29/2021: Summons Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

1/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/05/2024

Hearing12/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2024

Hearing03/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2024

Hearing02/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: XPO Logistics Port Services, Limited Liability Company, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Guerrero Trucking, an unknown business entity (Defendant); Braulio A. De Mora Villegas (Defendant); Luis Guerrero Loor (Defendant); As to: Francisco Camcho Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/22/2024 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 03/07/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: XPO Logistics Port Services, Limited Liability Company, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); As to: Francisco Camcho Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/24/2023 10:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/07/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: XPO Logistics Port Services, Limited Liability Company, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
12/27/2021

DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Francisco Camcho Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: XPO Logistics Port Services, Limited Liability Company, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Guerrero Trucking, an unknown business entity (Defendant); Braulio A. De Mora Villegas (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Francisco Camcho Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: XPO Logistics Port Services, Limited Liability Company, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Guerrero Trucking, an unknown business entity (Defendant); Braulio A. De Mora Villegas (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Francisco Camcho Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: XPO Logistics Port Services, Limited Liability Company, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Guerrero Trucking, an unknown business entity (Defendant); Braulio A. De Mora Villegas (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******5013 Hearing Date: January 27, 2023 Dept: 28

Defendant XPO Logistics Port Services, LLC’s Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories and Special Interrogatories

Having considered the moving, opposing and reply papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On December 9, 2021, Plaintiff Francisco Camcho Gonzalez (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants XPO Logistics Port Services, LLC (“XPO”), Guerrero Trucking (“Guerrero”), Braulio A. De Mora Villegas (“Villegas”) and Luis Guerrero Loor (“Loor”) for negligence.

On December 27, 2021, Plaintiff filed a FAC.

On February 17, 2022, Defendants filed an answer.

On October 28, 2022, XPO filed a Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories and Special Interrogatories to be heard on January 27, 2023. On January 17, 2023, Plaintiff filed an opposition. On January 18, 2023, XPO filed a reply.

Trial is currently scheduled for June 8, 2023.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

XPO requests the Court grant the motions to compel responses to form interrogatories and special interrogatories within 15 days of the hearing on the motion. XPO requests the Court impose sanctions of $1,240.00 on Plaintiff.

Plaintiff requests the Court deny the motion and the request for sanctions.

LEGAL STANDARD

Under California Code of Civil Procedure 2031.300, “If a party to whom a demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling is directed fails to serve a timely response to it, the following rules shall apply: (b) The party making the demand may move for an order compelling response to the demand.” According to CCP 2030.260, for a response to interrogatories to be timely, it must be served within 30 days of service. CCP 2031.260 provides the same 30-day deadline for request for production responses.

California Code of Civil Procedure 2023.030(a) provides that “[t]he court may impose a monetary sanction ordering that one engaging in the misuse of the discovery process, or any attorney advising that conduct, or both pay the reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred by anyone as a result of that conduct.” According to CCP 2023.010(d), misuse of the discovery process includes “failing to respond or to submit to an authorized method of discovery.”

California Code of Civil Procedure 2030.290(c) states that “the court shall impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010) against any party, person, or attorney who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel a response to interrogatories, unless it finds that the one subject to the sanction acted with substantial justification or that other circumstances make the imposition of the sanction unjust.”

DISCUSSION

Discovery

On February 18, 2022, XPO served discovery on Plaintiff. Responses were due on March 22, 2022. XPO granted an extension, during which Villegas filed for bankruptcy, resulting in a stay on the case. The bankruptcy case was discharged on June 13, 2022; despite this, Plaintiff has yet to serve any responses.

Plaintiff argues that the lack of response was due to mistake, inadvertence, or excusable neglect. Plaintiff specifically notes that XPO stopped including Plaintiff counsel’s staff on emails, and that at least one attorney was no longer with the firm. The Court finds this to be inexcusable neglect; a party is responsible for serving timely discovery responses, regardless of reminders by the serving party. Additionally, there is no indication that no attorney received emails from XPO. The bankruptcy issue has been resolved for approximately 7 months now, providing more than enough time for Plaintiff to have submitted responses. As Plaintiff has not, the Court grants the motion.

Sanctions

Sanctions are warranted, as Plaintiff failed to provide any responses prior to the hearing on the motion, constituting a misuse of the discovery process.

XPO requests sanctions of $1,240.00, based upon 4 hours of attorney’s work, at a rate of $195.00 per hour and 1 $60.00 filling fee. First, the Court notes that the total should only amount to $840.00. The Court also notes this should have been filed as two separate motions and will impose an additional $60.00 filling fee on XPO. Attorney’s work comprised of 1 hour to draft, 2 hours to reply, and 1 hour to appear at the hearing. The Court grants sanctions totaling $705.00.

CONCLUSION

Defendant XPO Logistics Port Services, LLC’s Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories and Special Interrogatories is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to provide responses, without objections, within 15 days of the hearing on the motion.

Defendant XPO Logistics Port Services, LLC’s is GRANTED. Plaintiff’s counsel is ordered to pay XPO $705.00 in sanctions within 30 days of the hearing on the motion.

XPO is ordered to pay the Court one additional $60.00 filling fee.

Moving party is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Moving Party is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.



Case Number: *******5013 Hearing Date: January 26, 2023 Dept: 28

Defendant XPO Logistics Port Services, LLC’s Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents.

Having considered the moving, opposing and reply papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On December 9, 2021, Plaintiff Francisco Camcho Gonzalez (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants XPO Logistics Port Services, LLC (“XPO”), Guerrero Trucking (“Guerrero”), Braulio A. De Mora Villegas (“Villegas”) and Luis Guerrero Loor (“Loor”) for negligence.

On December 27, 2021, Plaintiff filed a FAC.

On February 17, 2022, Defendants filed an answer.

On October 28, 2022, XPO filed a Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents to be heard on January 26, 2023. On January 12, 2023, Plaintiff filed an opposition. On January 18, 2023, XPO filed a reply.

Trial is currently scheduled for June 8, 2023.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

XPO requests the Court grant the motions to compel responses to request for discovery within 15 days of the hearing on the motion. XPO requests the Court impose sanctions of $1,240.00 on Plaintiff.

Plaintiff requests the Court deny the motion and the request for sanctions.

LEGAL STANDARD

Under California Code of Civil Procedure 2031.300, “If a party to whom a demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling is directed fails to serve a timely response to it, the following rules shall apply: (b) The party making the demand may move for an order compelling response to the demand.” According to CCP 2030.260, for a response to interrogatories to be timely, it must be served within 30 days of service. CCP 2031.260 provides the same 30-day deadline for request for production responses.

California Code of Civil Procedure 2023.030(a) provides that “[t]he court may impose a monetary sanction ordering that one engaging in the misuse of the discovery process, or any attorney advising that conduct, or both pay the reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred by anyone as a result of that conduct.” According to CCP 2023.010(d), misuse of the discovery process includes “failing to respond or to submit to an authorized method of discovery.”

California Code of Civil Procedure 2030.290(c) states that “the court shall impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010) against any party, person, or attorney who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel a response to interrogatories, unless it finds that the one subject to the sanction acted with substantial justification or that other circumstances make the imposition of the sanction unjust.”

DISCUSSION

Discovery

On February 18, 2022, XPO served discovery on Plaintiff. Responses were due on March 22, 2022. XPO granted an extension, during which Villegas filed for bankruptcy, resulting in a stay on the case. The bankruptcy case was discharged on June 13, 2022; despite this, Plaintiff has yet to serve any responses.

Plaintiff argues that the lack of response was due to mistake, inadvertence, or excusable neglect. Plaintiff specifically notes that XPO stopped including Plaintiff counsel’s staff on emails, and that at least one attorney was no longer with the firm. The Court finds this to be inexcusable neglect; a party is responsible for serving timely discovery responses, regardless of reminders by the serving party. Additionally, there is no indication that no attorney received emails from XPO. The bankruptcy issue has been resolved for approximately 7 months now, providing more than enough time for Plaintiff to have submitted responses. As Plaintiff has not, the Court grants the motion.

Sanctions

Sanctions are warranted, as Plaintiff failed to provide any responses prior to the hearing on the motion, constituting a misuse of the discovery process.

XPO requests sanctions of $1,240.00, based upon 4 hours of attorney’s work, at a rate of $195.00 per hour and 1 $60.00 filling fee. First, the Court notes that the total should only amount to $840.00. Attorney’s work comprised of 1 hour to draft, 2 hours to reply, and 1 hour to appear at the hearing. The Court grants sanctions totaling $645.00.

CONCLUSION

Defendant XPO Logistics Port Services, LLC’s Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to provide responses, without objections, within 15 days of the hearing on the motion.

Defendant XPO Logistics Port Services, LLC’s is GRANTED. Plaintiff’s counsel is ordered to pay XPO $645.00 in sanctions within 30 days of the hearing on the motion.

Moving party is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Moving Party is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.