This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2023 at 05:34:57 (UTC).

FRANCISCO A. SALDANA, ET AL. VS NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 FRANCISCO A SALDANA, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1925

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ ABRAHAM

SALDANA FRANCISCO A.

Defendant

NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANBERRY VINCENT C.

Defendant Attorney

LA MAR MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

5/26/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; FURTHER STATUS CONFE...)

5/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; FURTHER STATUS CONFE...)

Notice - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON- OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS TO ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION

5/15/2023: Notice - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON- OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS TO ARBITRATION AND STAY ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

5/9/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration - DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF AVI GHOLIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

5/9/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF AVI GHOLIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN SWEET IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

5/9/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN SWEET IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Notice - DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION (1) TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS TO ARBITRATION AND (2) STAY ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE COMPLETION OF ARBIT

5/9/2023: Notice - DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION (1) TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS INDIVIDUAL PAGA CLAIMS TO ARBITRATION AND (2) STAY ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE COMPLETION OF ARBIT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

4/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 04/12/2023

4/12/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 04/12/2023

Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/4/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN SWEET

4/4/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN SWEET

Notice of Related Case

3/29/2023: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/6/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/30/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/30/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/30/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2024
  • Hearing04/23/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Defendant Nationwide Legal, LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings: Filed By: NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • Docket[Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Nationwide Legal, LLCs Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings; Signed and Filed by: NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC (Defendant); As to: Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 04/23/2024 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Further Status Confe...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 updated: Result Date to 05/26/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/23/2024 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs Notice of Non- Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Individual PAGA Claims to Arbitration and Stay All Further Proceedings Pending the Completion of Arbitration; Filed by: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDefendant Nationwide Legal, LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings; Filed by: NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC (Defendant); As to: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Kevin Sweet in Support of Defendant Nationwide Legal, LLC's Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings; Filed by: NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketAddress for Vincent C. Granberry (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch in Department 39 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less