This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 02:48:50 (UTC).

FRANCISCO A. SALDANA, ET AL. VS NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 FRANCISCO A SALDANA, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7132

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ ABRAHAM

SALDANA FRANCISCO A.

Defendant

NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANBERRY VINCENT C.

Defendant Attorney

LA MAR MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Status Conference Statement

5/19/2023: Status Conference Statement

Notice - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON- OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

5/15/2023: Notice - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON- OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING AVI GHOLIANS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS A

5/9/2023: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING AVI GHOLIANS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS A

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AVI GHOLIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

5/9/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AVI GHOLIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL INDIVIDUAL ARBITRATION, STRIKE CLASS CLAIMS AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Ruling

4/18/2023: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

4/14/2023: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

4/14/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFENDANT ...)

4/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFENDANT ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

4/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 04/12/2023

4/12/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 04/12/2023

Status Conference Statement - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

4/6/2023: Status Conference Statement - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice of Related Case

3/29/2023: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/17/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/17/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Status Conference Statement

2/16/2023: Status Conference Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT JOINT INITIAL

1/20/2023: Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT JOINT INITIAL

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2024
  • Hearing04/23/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 04/23/2024 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Further Status Confe...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 updated: Result Date to 05/26/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/23/2024 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Joint Further Status Conference Statement: Exact Name: Joint Further Status Conference Statement ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Statement; Filed by: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs Notice Of Non- Opposition To Defendants Motion To Compel Individual Arbitration, Strike Class Claims And Stay Proceedings; Filed by: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Nationwide Legal, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNotice Defendant Nationwide Legal, Llcs Notice of Errata Regarding Avi Gholians Declaration in Support of Nationwide Legal, Llcs Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings; Filed by: Nationwide Legal, LLC (Defendant); As to: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Avi Gholian in Support of Defendant Nationwide Legal, Llcs Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration, Strike Class Claims and Stay Proceedings; Filed by: Nationwide Legal, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David S. Cunningham III in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Nationwide Legal, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Nationwide Legal, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Francisco A. Saldana (Plaintiff); Abraham Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Nationwide Legal, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less