Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2021 at 12:33:38 (UTC).

FRANCISCA MANTUPAR RECEDE VS DIANE SUE ROBB

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 FRANCISCA MANTUPAR RECEDE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIANE SUE ROBB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1089

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RECEDE FRANCISCA MANTUPAR

Defendant

ROBB DIANE SUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASSERMAN ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

ADEM STEPHANIE N.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/12/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/19/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/19/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/19/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/14/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Francisca Mantupar Recede (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Diane Sue Robb (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Diane Sue Robb (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Diane Sue Robb (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Francisca Mantupar Recede (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Francisca Mantupar Recede (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Francisca Mantupar Recede (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Francisca Mantupar Recede (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADEM STEPHANIE N.