This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 11:14:44 (UTC).

FRANCISCA ELIZABETH ORTIZ VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, AN OHIO CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 FRANCISCA ELIZABETH ORTIZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, AN OHIO CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6047

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTIZ FRANCISCA ELIZABETH

Defendants

THE KROGER CO. AN OHIO CORPORATION

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY AN OHIO CORPORATION

PROUGH STEVEN J

SCHWILKE THOMAS L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAFII DANIEL JACOB

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO FRANK J

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

9/2/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/2/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

5/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/20/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/28/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2024
  • Hearing04/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • Hearing10/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, an Ohio corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, an Ohio corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FRANCISCA ELIZABETH ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FRANCISCA ELIZABETH ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FRANCISCA ELIZABETH ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FRANCISCA ELIZABETH ORTIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE KROGER CO. AN OHIO CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAFII DANIEL JACOB