This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 02:19:46 (UTC).

FRANCIS GERARD RUSHFORD VS CITIGROUP INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 FRANCIS GERARD RUSHFORD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITIGROUP INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1809

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSHFORD FRANCIS GERARD

Defendants

AT&T CORP.

CITI SAFEGUARD

CITIBANK N.A.

CITIGROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSHFORD FRANCIS

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS GLEAM

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/14/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/24/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

4/12/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • Hearing05/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Hearing05/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by AT&T Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Francis Gerard Rushford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Francis Gerard Rushford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Francis Gerard Rushford (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSHFORD FRANCIS