This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 03:22:14 (UTC).

FRANCES SANTIAGO VS ST. ANDREWS PLACE APARTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 FRANCES SANTIAGO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ST ANDREWS PLACE APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8621

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTIAGO FRANCES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ST. ANDREWS PLACE APARTMENTS

PAUL CALVO & CO

CALVO GROUP

THE CALVO FAMILY HOUSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PAUL CALVO AND COMPANY

GUERRERO FRANCISCO

VAUGHAN RUSSELL

DANIELS ROBERT I.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CALVO GROUP

PAUL CALVO AND COMPANY

Cross Defendant and Defendant

GUERRERO FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SAFARIAN HARRY A.

ANDERSON III EDOR G.

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/3/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Cross-Complaint

11/13/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

11/13/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/13/2020: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/4/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

1/12/2021: Answer

Answer

1/12/2021: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/13/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Substitution of Attorney

2/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

5/19/2021: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/21/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/27/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

6/9/2021: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

6/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Hearing07/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Hearing07/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Frances Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Frances Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Paul Calvo & Co (Defendant); Paul Calvo and Company (Defendant); Calvo Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Paul Calvo and Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Paul Calvo and Company (Defendant); Calvo Group (Defendant); The Calvo Family Housing Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Frances Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Frances Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Frances Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Frances Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALVO GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CALVO FAMILY HOUSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where PAUL CALVO AND COMPANY REAL ESTATE MGMT CO is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. ANDREWS PLACE, LLC. is a litigant