This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 14:15:55 (UTC).

FRANCES MCKENNA, ET AL. VS ACUITY EYE GROUP

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 FRANCES MCKENNA, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ACUITY EYE GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0194

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCKENNA FRANCES

MCKENNA PABLO

Defendants

ACUITY EYE GROUP

ASC ORANGE COUNTY AMBULATORY SURGERY CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKON CRAIG S.

Defendant Attorney

WERRE GREGORY DALE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/27/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/27/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/27/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/27/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/24/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/13/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/13/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

3/13/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/15/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • Hearing06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Frances Mckenna (Plaintiff); Pablo Mckenna (Plaintiff); As to: ASC Orange County Ambulatory Surgery Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Acuity Eye Group (Defendant); As to: Frances Mckenna (Plaintiff); Pablo Mckenna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Acuity Eye Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Acuity Eye Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Frances Mckenna (Plaintiff); Pablo Mckenna (Plaintiff); As to: Acuity Eye Group (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/20/2023; Service Cost: 64.89; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from Acuity Eye Group (Defendant) to Acuity Eye Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Acuity Eye Group (Defendant) to Acuity Eye Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Summons on Complaint; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from Acuity Eye Group (Defendant) to Acuity Eye Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Frances Mckenna (Plaintiff); Pablo Mckenna (Plaintiff); As to: Acuity Eye Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frances Mckenna (Plaintiff); Pablo Mckenna (Plaintiff); As to: Acuity Eye Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Frances Mckenna (Plaintiff); Pablo Mckenna (Plaintiff); As to: Acuity Eye Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less