This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 03:08:47 (UTC).

FRAN COHEN VS MENASHI COHEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 FRAN COHEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MENASHI COHEN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3813

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN FRAN

Defendants

COHEN MENASHI

DAYANI SEAN

DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TATONE MICHELANGELO

Defendant Attorney

ALPER ANDREW KEITH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/31/2023: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/31/2023: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

1/31/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

1/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/12/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

12/12/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIO...)

10/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 08/23/2022

8/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 08/23/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER PROPOSED] ORDER SUSTAINING DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION'S DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND DISMISSAL OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION WITH PREJUDICE

6/6/2022: Order - ORDER PROPOSED] ORDER SUSTAINING DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION'S DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND DISMISSAL OF DAYCO FUNDING CORPORATION WITH PREJUDICE

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/30/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/30/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Case Management Statement

12/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

12/23/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

12/23/2021: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

12/23/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; Filed by: Fran Cohen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil: Filed By: Michelangelo Tatone (Attorney); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Signed and Filed by: Michelangelo Tatone (Attorney); As to: Fran Cohen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 04/11/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Michelangelo Tatone (Attorney); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to 01/26/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Fran Cohen (Plaintiff); As to: Menashi Cohen (Defendant); Sean Dayani (Defendant); Dayco Funding Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Michelangelo Tatone (Attorney): Organization Name changed from TATONE LAW, APC to Tatone Law, APC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketAddress for Michelangelo Tatone (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Fran Cohen (Plaintiff); As to: Menashi Cohen (Defendant); Sean Dayani (Defendant); Dayco Funding Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Fran Cohen (Plaintiff); As to: Menashi Cohen (Defendant); Sean Dayani (Defendant); Dayco Funding Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Fran Cohen (Plaintiff); As to: Menashi Cohen (Defendant); Sean Dayani (Defendant); Dayco Funding Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less