This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2021 at 22:31:44 (UTC).

FOX HILLS PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION VS SIENTY LIU

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 FOX HILLS PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SIENTY LIU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1102

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOX HILLS PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

Defendant

LIU SIENTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRODE MATTHEW LAWRENCE

Defendant Attorney

LUBIN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/23/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

7/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint

6/24/2021: Amended Complaint

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

6/24/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Answer

8/6/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • Hearing12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SIENTY LIU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by FOX HILLS PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, a California nonprofit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FOX HILLS PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, a California nonprofit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by FOX HILLS PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, a California nonprofit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FOX HILLS PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, a California nonprofit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FOX HILLS PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, a California nonprofit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FOX HILLS PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, a California nonprofit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUBIN MICHAEL