This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 04:52:25 (UTC).

FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS VS. GROWTHPOINT GLOBAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GROWTHPOINT GLOBAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9045

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS LLC

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

CLARK PRESTON

GROWTHPOINT STRUCTURES

GROWTHPOINT GLOBAL INC.

DOES 1-50

GROWTHPOINT GLOBAL INC. DBA GROWTHPOINT STRUCTIRES

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FILER NORMAN A.

FILER NORMAN ALLEN

Defendant Attorneys

CHEE LYNDON Y.

KENDRICK JOHN J. JR.

KENDRICK JOHN J. JR

MADNICK H MARK

MADNICK HARRIS MARK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/11/2019: Minute Order

Judgment

6/27/2019: Judgment

Judgment

6/6/2019: Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for

5/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

5/22/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/13/2019: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

4/30/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Notice of Motion

4/30/2019: Notice of Motion

Minute Order

5/1/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

5/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Certificate of Mailing for

5/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice

4/15/2019: Notice

Minute Order

4/19/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/15/2019: Minute Order

Legacy Document

9/4/2018: Legacy Document

Notice of Ruling

9/6/2018: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

3/27/2019: Request for Dismissal

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketJudgment (by Court after Court Trial Defendant did not appear at Trial); Filed by FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:09 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Receipt of Proposed Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Order to Show Cause Re: ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketJudgment (by Court after Court Trial Defendant did not appear at Trial); Filed by FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (re Receipt of Proposed Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: re Receipt of Proposed Judgment) of 05/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re Receipt of Proposed Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (re Receipt of Proposed Judgment) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (re Receipt of Proposed Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GROWTHPOINT GLOBAL, INC. (Defendant); GROWTHPOINT STRUCTURES (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department A; (Case Ordered Reassigned; Case Reassigned for all purposes) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GROWTHPOINT GLOBAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FOUNDATION BUILDING MATERIALS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENDRICK JOHN J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MADNICK HARRIS MARK