This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2023 at 09:47:16 (UTC).

FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS ESOS RING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESOS RING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1695

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ESOS RING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ESOS RING

SILVERSTEIN MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLANDA JON O.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/29/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

1/11/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company on 09/29/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: ESOS RING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MICHELLE SILVERSTEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: ESOS RING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MICHELLE SILVERSTEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: ESOS RING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MICHELLE SILVERSTEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FORWARDLINE FINANCIAL, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: ESOS RING, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); MICHELLE SILVERSTEIN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. H. Jay Ford III in Department O Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less