Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 09:33:56 (UTC).

FORWARD FINANCING, LLC VS MORE SHIP HAPPENS INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 FORWARD FINANCING, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against MORE SHIP HAPPENS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0011

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FORWARD FINANCING LLC

Respondents

SCOTT JOHN FITZGERALD

MORE SHIP HAPPENS INC DBA MORE SHIP HAPPENS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRADISH MARIA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition

1/20/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

1/14/2021: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • Hearing05/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Forward Financing, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Forward Financing, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORWARD FINANCING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADISH MARIA