Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2021 at 03:55:22 (UTC).

FORWARD FINANCING, LLC VS JONATHAN SEREBRIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 FORWARD FINANCING, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against JONATHAN SEREBRIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0057

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FORWARD FINANCING LLC

Respondents

SEREBRIN JONATHAN AKA JONATHAN HARRY SEREBRIN

JONATHAN SEREBRIN MD INC DBA NEW HEALTH CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRADISH MARIA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition

3/9/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

3/4/2021: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Hearing on Petition To Confirm Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Forward Financing, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Forward Financing, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORWARD FINANCING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADISH MARIA