Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2021 at 10:31:51 (UTC).

FORREST, GEAULAH ELMA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 FORREST, GEAULAH ELMA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6939

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FORREST ALFRED

Claimant

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

Decedent

FORREST GEAULAH ELMA

Interested Party

FORREST ERNESTINE

Not Classified By Court

MAINSTAIN MORRIS

HUTCHINSON ROBERT F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEWELLYN LARRY DARRYL

 

Court Documents

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

4/15/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Minute Order

2/3/2021: Minute Order

Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - ORDER FOR PROBATE

2/4/2021: Proposed Order - Order for Probate (DE-140) - ORDER FOR PROBATE

Supplement - to Response to Joint Declaration of ALfred Forrest and Elma Stewart

2/4/2021: Supplement - to Response to Joint Declaration of ALfred Forrest and Elma Stewart

Withdrawal - Special Notice

2/8/2021: Withdrawal - Special Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALFRED FORREST AND ELMA STEWART IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSION OF LOST WILL

1/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALFRED FORREST AND ELMA STEWART IN SUPPORT OF ADMISSION OF LOST WILL

Notice - Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

12/21/2020: Notice - Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

Miscellaneous Document

12/16/2020: Miscellaneous Document

Request - Special Notice (No Fee)

12/7/2020: Request - Special Notice (No Fee)

Objection

12/1/2020: Objection

Proof of Publication

11/24/2020: Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

11/24/2020: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LARRY D. LEWELLYN RE: STATUS

11/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LARRY D. LEWELLYN RE: STATUS

Minute Order

11/12/2020: Minute Order

Creditor's Claim

9/10/2020: Creditor's Claim

Minute Order

9/10/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - NOTICE OF HEARING

8/24/2020: Notice - Hearing - NOTICE OF HEARING

Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial)

8/24/2020: Petition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • Hearing05/04/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Hearing06/15/2021 at 3:00 PM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMotion (for Reconsideration of Court's Setting of Bond of $20,000 ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketWithdrawal - Special Notice; Filed by Probate Referee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSupplement (to Response to Joint Declaration of ALfred Forrest and Elma Stewart ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (No Fee); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketPetition - Determine Succession to Real Prop (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (NOTICE OF HEARING ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWELLYN LARRY DARRYL