This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 20:46:31 (UTC).

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN VS CTMAX DEVELOPMENT INC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CTMAX DEVELOPMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COLIN P. LEIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0280

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COLIN P. LEIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS MICHIGAN

Defendant

CTMAX DEVELOPMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK KEVIN H.

Defendant Attorney

BUBION JUSTIN ARNOLD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/17/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/17/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/27/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Answer

8/15/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

9/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN A. BUBION, ESQ. RE NON-APPEARANCE AT OCTOBER 14, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/27/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN A. BUBION, ESQ. RE NON-APPEARANCE AT OCTOBER 14, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Hearing03/09/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Hearing01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions in the Amount up to $1,500 Against Defendant pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 177.5 for Failure to Appear on 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration OF JUSTIN A. BUBION, ESQ. RE NON-APPEARANCE AT OCTOBER 14, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: CTMAX DEVELOPMENT INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions in the Amount up to $1,500 Against Defendant pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 177.5 for Failure to Appear on 10/14/2022 scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Mediation and Discovey scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 09:00 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Colin P. Leis in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: CTMAX DEVELOPMENT INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: CTMAX DEVELOPMENT INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: CTMAX DEVELOPMENT INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY GRAND RAPIDS, MICHIGAN (Plaintiff); As to: CTMAX DEVELOPMENT INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less