This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 06:25:11 (UTC).

FORA FINANCIAL WEST LLC VS JERZAN TORREZ

Case Summary

On 09/12/2017 FORA FINANCIAL WEST LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JERZAN TORREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9610

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORA FINANCIAL WEST LLC

Defendants

E&J GENRAL BUILDING CONTRACTORS

TORREZ JERZAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATZ STUART

KATZ STUART A. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

BEAUDRY ESQ. STEPHANIE L.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default Judgment

7/23/2018: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department O, Dukes, Robert A., Presiding; Judgment Debtors Examination (C/F 6-14-18+BODY ATTACHMENT HELD FROM 6-14-18) - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Application; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department O, Dukes, Robert A., Presiding; Judgment Debtors Examination - Matter continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketWrit-Other (ISSUED TO LA CO ); Filed by Judgment Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Application (ORAP ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department O, Dukes, Robert A., Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Default Judg - Judgment granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JOHN COSCIA IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 585 (d) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketDismissal of Does (RE: DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE, ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketJudgment (BY COURT BY DEFAULT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department O, Dukes, Robert A., Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDefault Entered (COURT JUDGMENT SENT TO DEPT O W/O FILE ON 1/24/18 (HRG 3/26/18) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketNotice (OF CMC ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9610    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: O

Plaintiff's application for default judgment is DENIED without prejudice for the following reasons:

  1. No entry of default.

  2. No dismissal of all parties against whom judgment is not sought or an application for separate judgment against specified parties under CCP section 579, supported by a showing of grounds for each judgment: Lack of dismissal of Doe defendants.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E&J GENRAL BUILDING CONTRACTORS is a litigant

Latest cases where FORA FINANCIAL WEST LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant