This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 15:47:06 (UTC).

FORA FINANCIAL FUNDING LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS BUZZLE.COM, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 FORA FINANCIAL FUNDING LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BUZZLE COM, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7765

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORA FINANCIAL FUNDING LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

BUZZLE.COM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PATEL DILIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IEZZA NICK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • Hearing12/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fora Financial Funding LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fora Financial Funding LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fora Financial Funding LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORA FINANCIAL FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IEZZA NICK