This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2023 at 03:00:17 (UTC).

FORA FINANCIAL ASSET SECURITIZATION 2021 LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS 315 SANCHEZ STREET, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 FORA FINANCIAL ASSET SECURITIZATION 2021 LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 315 SANCHEZ STREET, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0864

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORA FINANCIAL ASSET SECURITIZATION 2021 LLC

Defendants

BOGUE MARCUS

315 SANCHEZ STREET LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IEZZA NICK I.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/29/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/3/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/01/2023

3/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/01/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE:DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ...)

5/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE:DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE:DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ...) OF 05/02/2023

5/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE:DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE ...) OF 05/02/2023

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Fora Financial Asset Securitization 2021 LLC, a Delaware limited liability company on 12/29/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re:Dismissal for Failure to Serve ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re:Dismissal for Failure to Serve ...) of 05/02/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re:Dismissal for Failure to Serve Complaint scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 updated: Result Date to 05/02/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re:Dismissal for Failure to Serve Complaint scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/01/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- 315 Sanchez Street, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from 315 Sanchez Street, LLC, a California limited liability company to 315 Sanchez Street, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Fora Financial Asset Securitization 2021 LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: 315 Sanchez Street, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Marcus Bogue (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Fora Financial Asset Securitization 2021 LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: 315 Sanchez Street, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Marcus Bogue (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Fora Financial Asset Securitization 2021 LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: 315 Sanchez Street, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Marcus Bogue (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Holly J. Fujie in Department 56 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less