This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2023 at 13:35:06 (UTC).

FLORI ESTRADA VS ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 FLORI ESTRADA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3068

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTRADA FLORI

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. A CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSMAN ESQ ROBERT S

Defendant Attorney

WATERKOTTE GRANT DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

10/7/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10/7/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

11/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/10/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

11/10/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2024
  • Hearing10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2024
  • Hearing04/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2024
  • Hearing03/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., a Corporation (Defendant); As to: FLORI ESTRADA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., a Corporation (Defendant); As to: ROES 1 through 10, inclusive (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSummons CROSS-COMPLAINT; Issued and Filed by: ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: FLORI ESTRADA (Plaintiff); As to: ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., a Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/12/2022; Service Cost: 144.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FLORI ESTRADA (Plaintiff); As to: ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FLORI ESTRADA (Plaintiff); As to: ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FLORI ESTRADA (Plaintiff); As to: ANASTASI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., a Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less