This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 14:54:12 (UTC).

FLORES, JOSE ADALBERTO VS ROSALES, SARA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 FLORES, JOSE ADALBERTO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ROSALES, SARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8214

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FLORES JOSE ADALBERTO

Respondent

ROSALES SARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

JONES AYINDE ADISA

JONES AYINDE

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

7/20/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/20/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/19/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

7/19/2021: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

7/19/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

9/24/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

9/24/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

9/24/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution & Property Declaration

9/24/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution & Property Declaration

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

12/30/2021: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

12/30/2021: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

12/30/2021: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

12/30/2021: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

12/30/2021: Declaration - Default FL170

Proof of Service of Summons

12/30/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated (426-reviewed ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Response to Dissolution & Property Declaration ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES AYINDE A