This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 14:18:52 (UTC).

FLORES HERNANDEZ, ESWAN VS FLORES, KAYLEE ANN

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 FLORES HERNANDEZ, ESWAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FLORES, KAYLEE ANN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, H. DON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0584

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, H. DON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FLORES HERNANDEZ ESWAN

Respondent

FLORES KAYLEE ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NOGUEDA NORMA NELLY

Respondent Attorney

AGUIRRE GINA MARIE

Other Attorneys

BARNITT PATRICK J.

BARNITT PATRICK JOHN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/8/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/7/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing

10/14/2021: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

8/24/2021: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

7/6/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Order - Findings and Order After Hearing

7/1/2021: Order - Findings and Order After Hearing

Minute Order

7/1/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Change of Address

6/14/2021: Notice - Change of Address

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

5/19/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Order - Order Appointing Counsel for Minor's Family Code Section 3150

5/19/2021: Order - Order Appointing Counsel for Minor's Family Code Section 3150

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/28/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Minute Order

4/28/2021: Minute Order

Declaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303

4/28/2021: Declaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303

Minute Order

4/28/2021: Minute Order

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support

4/28/2021: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

4/28/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - UCCJEA

4/28/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

4/28/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • Hearing03/10/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department C at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration-Notice on Request-Temp Emergency Orders FL-303; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation, Child Support; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARNITT PATRICK J.