This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2022 at 03:28:25 (UTC).

FLORENCIA SANCHEZ VS VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 FLORENCIA SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0193

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ FLORENCIA

Defendants

VSI INC

VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC.

VALLARTA PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DUNBAR KEVIN TERRENCE

Other Attorneys

MARCUS GERALD LEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

12/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/5/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Florencia Sanchez (Plaintiff); Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Florencia Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. erroneously sued and served as Vallarta Supermarkets); Filed by Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Florencia Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Florencia Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Florencia Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLARTA PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VSI INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE