This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 06:11:48 (UTC).

FLORA DAISY CASTRO VS THRIFTY OIL CO.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 FLORA DAISY CASTRO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THRIFTY OIL CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7852

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTRO FLORA DAISY

Defendant

THRIFTY OIL CO.

Not Classified By Court

ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS DAISY

Defendant Attorney

YOUNG ADAM C.

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

HONEYMAR JR. MICHAEL

WILLIAMS JEFFREY JAMES

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/23/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/15/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

6/15/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Lien

9/2/2021: Notice of Lien

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • Hearing08/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Zenith Insurance Company (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by THRIFTY OIL CO. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by THRIFTY OIL CO. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by FLORA DAISY CASTRO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FLORA DAISY CASTRO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FLORA DAISY CASTRO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FLORA DAISY CASTRO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THRIFTY OIL CO. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Jeffrey R.