This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 04:11:57 (UTC).

FLORA AYALA VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 FLORA AYALA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1636

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

AYALA FLORA

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BOOKER II ROBERT L. ESQ.

SARANI SHABNAM L. II ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

JONES ANGELA M. ASSISTANT GENERAL COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

11/1/2017: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Proof of Personal Service

12/19/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/13/2017: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/23/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Ex Parte Application

5/23/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/23/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

5/22/2019: Declaration

Opposition

5/22/2019: Opposition

Declaration

3/29/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/29/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/29/2019: Declaration

Motion for Summary Judgment

3/29/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration

3/29/2019: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

3/29/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Stipulation and Order

1/25/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/31/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for 120 Days Respectively) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Defen...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for 120 Days Respectively); Filed by Flora Ayala (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketOpposition (LAUSD's Opposition to PL's Ex Parte Application); Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Angela Jones in Support of LAUSD's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application); Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Christian Perez in Support of LAUSD's MSJ); Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Sandra Velez in Support of LAUSD's MSJ); Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Angela Jones in Support of LAUSD's MSJ); Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Flora Ayala (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Flora Ayala (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint Demand for Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Flora Ayala (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1636    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 2

Flora v. Los Angeles Unified School District

The Court's tentative ruling is as follows: 

The Court has received and considered the Order and Alternate Writ of Mandate in this case.  Judge Georgina T. Rizk has retired, making her unavailable to handle this matter.  This Court now vacates Judge Rizk’s order of August 28, 2018 and enters a new and different order consistent with the Court of Appeal’s Order and Alternate Writ of Mandate. The Court grants Defendant Los Angeles Unified School District’s motion for summary adjudication and summary judgment that was filed on March 29, 2019.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARANI SHABNAM L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOKER II ROBERT L. ESQ.