This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2020 at 10:17:14 (UTC).

FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC. VS WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0283

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLEXI-VAN LEASING INC.

Defendants

WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC.

LIU TOMMY

WANG GUOXIANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/25/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/25/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/25/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/25/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • Hearing03/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FLEXI-VAN LEASING INC. is a litigant