This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 10:42:04 (UTC).

FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC. VS R.G.R. DIVERSIFIED SERVICES, INC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against R G R DIVERSIFIED SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8721

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLEXI-VAN LEASING INC.

Defendants

RIVERA RODOLFO

RGR TRANSPORT

R.G.R. DIVERSIFIED SERVICES INC.

DOES 1 TO 20

RIOS ARTHUR G.

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN & HECHT LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Unknown

7/3/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

7/17/2018: Minute Order

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

8/15/2018: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Minute Order

10/30/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Order to Appear for Examination; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • at 09:00 am in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Judgment Debtor Examination - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less