This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 00:24:18 (UTC).

FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC. VS. HAIYAN TANG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 FLEXI-VAN LEASING, INC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against HAIYAN TANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9253

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLEXI-VAN LEASING INC.

Defendants

3T HOLDING INC.

DOES 1-20

TANG TINA

TANG HAIYAN

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/6/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/3/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order

5/7/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/2/2019: Minute Order

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/3/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/3/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Complaint

8/15/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/15/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document

9/7/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

9/7/2018: Legacy Document

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

9/7/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Summons

8/15/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/15/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/15/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

8/15/2018: Summons

Complaint

8/15/2018: Complaint

Complaint

8/15/2018: Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute or Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute or Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute or...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute or Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute or...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Prosecute or Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute or...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketSummons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 3T HOLDING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLEXI-VAN LEASING INC. is a litigant