This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 01:48:04 (UTC).

FLEMING WUNG VS JERI JONES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 FLEMING WUNG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JERI JONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1876

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WUNG FLEMING

Defendants

HUANG NAN SHENG

JONES JERI

XIE ALEX

XIE AMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POSNER LAURENCE P

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/19/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2024
  • Hearing11/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • Hearing04/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fleming Wung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fleming Wung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fleming Wung (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POSNER LAURENCE P