This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 05:23:23 (UTC).

FISHER, JOSEPH VS FISHER, KELLY

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 FISHER, JOSEPH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FISHER, KELLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELLIS, STEVEN A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9570

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELLIS, STEVEN A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FISHER JOSEPH

Respondent

FISHER KELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STERNBERG CAROL

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

 

Court Documents

Judgment

7/5/2022: Judgment

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte - Application - $60.00 (Applications)

7/5/2022: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte - Application - $60.00 (Applications)

Minute Order

7/5/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

7/5/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) (Declarations)

7/5/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) (Declarations)

Notice - Entry of Judgment

7/5/2022: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers - Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (Appearances)

6/20/2022: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers - Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (Appearances)

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (Declarations)

6/20/2022: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (Declarations)

Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry - Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry (Judgments)

6/20/2022: Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry - Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry (Judgments)

Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated - Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated (Judgments)

6/20/2022: Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated - Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated (Judgments)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

6/15/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

Declaration - Default FL170 - Declaration - Default FL170 (Declarations)

6/20/2022: Declaration - Default FL170 - Declaration - Default FL170 (Declarations)

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

4/28/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses)

5/3/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses)

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/3/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

1/13/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons

10/18/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Summons

8/19/2021: Summons

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2C, Ellis, Steven A., Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (Ex Parte - Application - $60.00 (Applications) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) (Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given) (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketProposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated (Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated (Judgments) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170 (Declaration - Default FL170 (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - $435.00 (Responses) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROL