Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2021 at 10:05:54 (UTC).

FISHER, JAMISON VS MCCANN, KATHLEEN

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 FISHER, JAMISON filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against MCCANN, KATHLEEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COPS, JENNIFER H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1251

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COPS, JENNIFER H.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FISHER JAMISON

Respondent

MCCANN KATHLEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/22/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/29/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

9/29/2020: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

9/29/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Addendum

9/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Addendum

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

9/11/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/11/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment

9/11/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Cops, Jennifer H., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Cops, Jennifer H., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.