This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 20:29:36 (UTC).

FISCH, REBECCA ALEXANDRIA VS STEVENS, KURTIS JAMES

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 FISCH, REBECCA ALEXANDRIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STEVENS, KURTIS JAMES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6068

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FISCH REBECCA ALEXANDRIA

Respondent

STEVENS KURTIS JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MILES JOY KRAFT

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

6/2/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/2/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/26/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

5/26/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Summons

5/26/2021: Summons

Substitution of Attorney

8/19/2021: Substitution of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILES JOY KRAFT