This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2023 at 08:01:25 (UTC).

FIRST TECHNOLOGY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS ANGELICA ESCANDON

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 FIRST TECHNOLOGY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANGELICA ESCANDON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST TECHNOLOGY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

ESCANDON ANGELICA AKA ANGELICA ALLIANA ESCANDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH BARRY A.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/4/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/4/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: First Technology Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: First Technology Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Angelica Escandon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: First Technology Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Angelica Escandon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less