This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 07:37:22 (UTC).

FIRST CAPITAL GOLD, INC., ET AL VS. THOMAS L. KALKMAN

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 FIRST CAPITAL GOLD, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THOMAS L KALKMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2910

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

FCG E-COMMERCE

FIRST CAPITAL GOLD INC.

FIRST CAPITOL GOLD INC.

DAVENPORT EARL NELSON

FAULKNER CHRIS

ROES 1 - 10

KALKMAN THOMAS LEE

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

KALKMAN THOMAS LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CAROLE A. FAULKNER

FAULKNER CAROLE A.

FAULKNER CAROLE ANN

LEGGET MARC ALAN

BALL BYRON TALBOT

MANN JEFF A.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF LEE HARWELL JR.

HARWELL LEE WILLIS JR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

8/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice of Ruling

8/20/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Motion

6/26/2020: Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion

6/26/2020: Notice of Motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

4/28/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/9/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

5/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

1/10/2019: Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

Substitution of Attorney

2/5/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/5/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/6/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Case Management Statement

1/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order -

10/4/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order -

Answer -

7/9/2018: Answer -

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • Hearing04/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Hearing04/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Hearing02/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department B; Non-Jury Trial ((3 day estimate)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Trial, FSC); Filed by Thomas Lee Kalkman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Thomas Lee Kalkman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Thomas Lee Kalkman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Thomas Lee Kalkman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by First Capitol Gold, Inc. (Plaintiff); FCG E-Commerce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by First Capitol Gold, Inc. (Plaintiff); FCG E-Commerce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by First Capitol Gold, Inc. (Plaintiff); FCG E-Commerce (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FCG E-Commerce (Plaintiff); First Capitol Gold, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: YC072910    Hearing Date: August 20, 2020    Dept: B

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT – SOUTHWEST DISTRICT

Honorable Gary Y. Tanaka

Department B

Thursday – August 20, 2020

Calendar No. 6

PROCEEDINGS

First Capital Gold, Inc., et al. v. Thomas L. Kalkman, et al.

YC072910

  1. Thomas Lee Kalkman’s Motion to Compel Responses to Supplemental Interrogatories and Supplemental Requests for Production of Documents from First Capital Gold, Inc.
  2. Thomas Lee Kalkman’s Motion to Compel Responses to Supplemental Interrogatories and Supplemental Requests for Production of Documents from FCG Ecommerce, Inc.
  3. Thomas Lee Kalkman’s Motion to Compel Responses to Supplemental Interrogatories and Supplemental Requests for Production of Documents from Earl Nelson Davenport

TENTATIVE RULING

Thomas Lee Kalkman’s Motions to Compel Responses to Supplemental Interrogatories and Supplemental Requests for Production of Documents from First Capital Gold, Inc, FCG Ecommerce, Inc. and Earl Nelson Davenport are granted.

Response to Interrogatories

CCP § 2030.290 states: “If a party to whom interrogatories are directed fails to serve a timely response, the following rules apply: … (b) The party propounding the interrogatories may move for an order compelling response to the interrogatories.” (CCP § 2030.290(b).)

Inspection Demands

CCP § 2031.300 states: “If a party to whom a demand for inspection, copying, testing, or sampling is directed fails to serve a timely response to it, the following rules shall apply: … (b) The party making the demand may move for an order compelling response to the demand.” (CCP § 2031.300(b)).

Discussion

On February 12, 2020, Defendant and Cross-Complainant Thomas Kalkman propounded his Supplemental Interrogatories and Supplemental Requests for Production of Documents upon Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants First Capital Gold, Inc. and FCG Ecommerce, Inc., and Cross-Defendant Earl Nelson Davenport. Responses were due on March 18, 2020. No responses were received. (Declaration, Lee Harwell, ¶¶ 2-3.) Thus, the motions to compel responses to Supplemental Interrogatories and Supplemental Requests for Production of Documents are granted.

Ruling

The motions to compel responses to Supplemental Interrogatories and Supplemental Requests for Production of Documents are granted.

Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants First Capital Gold, Inc. and FCG Ecommerce, Inc., and Cross-Defendant Earl Nelson Davenport are ordered to serve responses to Supplemental Interrogatories and Supplemental Requests for Production of Documents without objections within 10 days of this date.

Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants First Capital Gold, Inc. and FCG Ecommerce, Inc., as well as Cross-Defendant Earl Nelson Davenport are each ordered to pay sanctions in the sum of $660.00 payable to moving party within 30 days of this date.

Defendant/Cross-Complainant is ordered to give notice of this ruling.