This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 08:30:35 (UTC).

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMP ANY, A NEBRASKA CORPORATION VS JUAN PABLO MORALES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMP ANY, A NEBRASKA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JUAN PABLO MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0851

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMP ANY A NEBRASKA CORPORATION

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

MORALES JUAN PABLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGERON WILLIAM BROOK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/22/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • Hearing11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMP ANY, a Nebraska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMP ANY, a Nebraska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMP ANY, a Nebraska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMP ANY, a Nebraska Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERGERON WILLIAM BROOK