This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2021 at 14:31:43 (UTC).

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE CO. VS SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE CO filed an Other lawsuit against SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3151

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE CO.

Respondents

PORTER-RIVERS ESTELLA CHARLENE

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHAKIBI KATAYOUN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

9/22/2021: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS

9/22/2021: Notice - FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS

Notice - NOTICE PETITIONER, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF ERRATA

9/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE PETITIONER, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF ERRATA

Notice of Related Case

9/23/2021: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/23/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/18/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • Hearing01/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by First American Title Insurance Co. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by First American Title Insurance Co. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (Petitioner, First American Title Insurance Company's Notice of Errata); Filed by First American Title Insurance Co. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by First American Title Insurance Co. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by First American Title Insurance Co. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketFirst American Title Insurance Company's Appendix of Exhibits; Filed by First American Title Insurance Co. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by First American Title Insurance Co. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAKIBI KATAYOUN