This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 15:40:37 (UTC).

FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS CRH CALIFORNIA WATER, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CRH CALIFORNIA WATER, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6000

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CRH CALIFORNIA WATER INC. DBA CULLIGAN OF SYLMAR

CULLIGAN INTERNATIONAL CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NGHIEM PHILLIP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2024
  • Hearing09/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Hearing03/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by First American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRH California Water Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CULLIGAN INTERNATIONAL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHILLIP B. NGHIEM