This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 03:59:00 (UTC).

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY VS THE HAUNTED DOLL, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE HAUNTED DOLL, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1905

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

THE HAUNTED DOLL LLC

PAUL STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LEICHTER KEVIN

Other Attorneys

FANT PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/9/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

1/28/2021: Answer

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/3/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT (CCP 664.6) AND ORDER

5/28/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT (CCP 664.6) AND ORDER

Case Management Statement

5/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

6/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation for Settlement (CCP 664.6) and Order); Filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Haunted Doll, LLC (Defendant); Steven Paul (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fant, Philip Arlington