Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2017 at 11:04:24 (UTC).

FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE COMPANY VS MICHAEL SULLIVAN FAMILY

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MICHAEL SULLIVAN FAMILY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG, GAIL FEUER and DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5589

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

GAIL FEUER

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

MICHAEL SULLIVAN FAMILY

THE JAMES M. AND MARGUERITE O. SULLIVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PLEVIN MARK D.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BUCKLEY WEBER ILECE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/25/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF DEFENSE COSTS

3/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF DEFENSE COSTS

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

3/29/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Unknown

4/21/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY

5/1/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY

Unknown

5/1/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

5/9/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/10/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC. 170.6)

5/16/2017: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC. 170.6)

Minute Order

6/2/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CASE TO DEPARTMENT ONE FOR REASSIGNMENT

6/6/2017: NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CASE TO DEPARTMENT ONE FOR REASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: 170.6 CCP REASSIGNMENT (WITH RELATED CASES)

6/13/2017: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: 170.6 CCP REASSIGNMENT (WITH RELATED CASES)

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; ETC

7/12/2017: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; ETC

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; ETC

7/12/2017: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; ETC

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/25/2017: FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; DECLARATION OF ILLECE BUCKLEY WEBER

8/1/2017: DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; DECLARATION OF ILLECE BUCKLEY WEBER

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

8/8/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/28/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • Stipulation (RE DISMISSAL OF LITIGATION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (JAMIE ONUKI CSR 13904 ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Reply to Opposition Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (ERRATUM TO OPPOSITION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Opposition Document (TO DEFTS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Declaration (OF BRENDAN V. MULLAN IN SUPPORT OF FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY'S OPP TO DEFTS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Request for Judicial Notice (FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH DEFS' NOTICE MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • Notice (OF COURT ORDER RE: 170.6 CCP REASSIGMENT WITH RELATED CASES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Notice (of transfer of case to dept. 1 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Answer to Complaint (AND REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY Michael Sullivan Family The James M. and Marguerite O. Sul) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Notice-Related Cases ( TO CASE NUMBER: BC475004 FILED ON 12/12/11 IN DPT. 78 AND BC616165 FILED ON 4/6/16 IN DPT. 78 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt (AS TO: Michael Sullivan ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Notice-Related Cases (TO CASE NUMBER: BC475004 FILED ON 12/12/11 IN DPT. 78 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE JAMES M. AND MARGUERITE O. SULLIVAN is a litigant

Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLEVIN MARK D.