Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2018 at 05:31:28 (UTC).

FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO VS ALICE CARSON

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE CO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALICE CARSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9018

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

CARSON ALICE

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MENDELSON LEE M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/29/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

7/19/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

7/19/2017: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. SUBROGATION CLAIM 2. INDEBTEDNESS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION; WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL