This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2020 at 01:30:41 (UTC).

FIRE PROTECTION GROUP, INC. VS. MARK LEVINE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 FIRE PROTECTION GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARK LEVINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7058

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA

Defendants and Respondents

KALANTARI NOSSRAT

LEVINE MARK

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

1845 FRANKLIN CANYON DRIVE LLC A CALIF.

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

KALANTARI HASSAN

DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

DAWSON TILEM & GOLE

GOLE GARY MICHAEL

GOLE GARY M

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

L/O OF ABDULAZIZ GROSSBART & RUDMAN

FINAMORE CATHERINE RIPOLONE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/14/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/14/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/12/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

12/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

Notice of Ruling

2/28/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

2/6/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/7/2019: Case Management Statement

SUMMONS -

9/10/2018: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/10/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT

9/10/2018: COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

9/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RECORDING OF NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS); ETC.

9/10/2018: NOTICE OF RECORDING OF NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS); ETC.

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/10/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

9/10/2018: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

9/10/2018: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • Hearing02/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Hearing01/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Final Status Conference and Trial); Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Mark Levine (Defendant); 1845 Franklin Canyon Drive, LLC, a Calif. (Defendant); International Fidelity Insurance Company, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLE GARY