This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 03:09:50 (UTC).

FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC VS 940 FIGUEROA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/01/2018 FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against 940 FIGUEROA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and DALILA CORRAL LYONS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6628

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC.

SAADIAN GEORGE AN INDIVIDUAL

SPECTRA COMPANY

SAADIAN GEORGE

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 10

940 FIGUEROA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ALTSCHULD BRUCE ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MATHIAS D. MACIEJEWSKI

MACIEJEWSKI MATHIAS D.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/23/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT BY CROSS DEFENDANTS FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC AND GEORGE SAADIAN

5/30/2018: ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT BY CROSS DEFENDANTS FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC AND GEORGE SAADIAN

PROOF OF SR VICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/28/2018: PROOF OF SR VICE OF SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/10/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/16/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

7/16/2018: Minute Order

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

8/13/2018: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Minute Order

8/15/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/24/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/17/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/17/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/17/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; 3. NEGILIGENCE 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF

4/6/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; 3. NEGILIGENCE 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF

Summons on Cross Complaint

4/6/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint

NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/16/2018: NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Minute Order

3/19/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

3/1/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Production - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Minute Order ((MOTION BY PLAINTIFF (FIRE PROTECTION GROUP, LLC), FOR ORDER T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Other - (Ruling for October 24, 2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Other - (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BRUCE ALTSCHULD); Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • PLAINTIFF FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT,/FOR CONTEMPT OF THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA AGAINST FIRE GUARD CORPORATION; DECLARATION OF BRUCE ALTSCHULD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Motion to Compel; Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 20; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (Conference-Informal Discovery; Not held-No appearances) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., SECTION 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (as to the Honorable Malcolm Mackey - Dept. 55); Filed by Fire Protection Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

O 00 ~Je

N b Pk ) ek pnd p— I Pk r—A.‘-n-- o \Op— o

| FILED |

| R Superior Court of Califorpia Bruce Altschuld, Esq. SBN 109510 County of Los Angeles 11755 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 1500 | | Los Angeles, CA 90025 - MAR 16 2014 (310) 442-3300 . (310) 442-8266 (fax) Sherri R. CagExecunve Officer/Cler§ of Court

Byrv‘ 1Peputy

Appearing for FIRE PROTECTION GROUP, LLC Raul Sanchez

SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CASE NO.BC 696628 V.55

Defendants.

NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

COMES NOW plaintiff who hereby files his Notice of Proof of Service of Summons and

Complaint. | | | Dated: 31/6![2 L& Al q,‘ 2&@{:3{/_ Bruce Altschu |

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SPECTRA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACIEJEWSKI MATHIAS DAVID