This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/31/2022 at 03:58:05 (UTC).

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0497

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

ZURN INDUSTRIES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUSHNER MICHAEL F.

Defendant Attorney

MULBARGER MITCHELL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/6/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

4/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/1/2022: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/27/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Case Management Statement

7/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • Hearing05/05/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/05/2023 at 09:00 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (5-6 day est.) scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U updated: Result Date to 08/09/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); As to: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Michael F. Kushner (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Stratman, Schwartz & Williams-Abrego to Farmers Insurance Subrogation & Recovery Law Firm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/02/2022; Service Cost: 101.94; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZURN INDUSTRIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MULBARGER MITCHELL F.