This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2023 at 03:31:11 (UTC).

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS 1948 MALCOLM VILLAS, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 1948 MALCOLM VILLAS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HELEN ZUKIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1249

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HELEN ZUKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

1948 MALCOLM VILLAS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIDIAN LINA S.

Defendant Attorney

MITTSKUS DANIELLE DUBE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/23/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Order - ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES

9/15/2021: Order - ORDER NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES

Answer

10/7/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

12/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange on 07/23/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 207 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: 1948 MALCOLM VILLAS, INC. (Defendant); As to: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Beverly Hills Courthouse in Department 207 - Hon. Helen Zukineffective 10/04/2021; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- 01/19/2022 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department P to Department 207

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOrder Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: 1948 MALCOLM VILLAS, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/28/2021; Service Cost: 118.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: 1948 MALCOLM VILLAS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: 1948 MALCOLM VILLAS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: 1948 MALCOLM VILLAS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FIRE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff); As to: 1948 MALCOLM VILLAS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less