This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2022 at 05:50:02 (UTC).

FIONA TRINITY VS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 FIONA TRINITY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0051

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

TRINITY FIONA

Appellants and Defendants

KADZHIKYAN ZENFIRA

NIKOGOSIAN LUCINE

LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA

CIGNA

CIGNA GROUP INSURANCE

ACE ATTORNEY SERVICE INC.

Not Classified By Court

RODRIGUEZ CESAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R.

Defendant Attorneys

MEHDIAN SHEERIN

BLUMBERG ROBERT

DARROW TANJA LAVONNE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)

8/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)

6/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/18/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)

3/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)

12/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL)

Notice of Appearance

8/9/2021: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE APPEAL; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/30/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/30/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT AND EXHIBITS FOR HEARING

1/8/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT AND EXHIBITS FOR HEARING

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CARRNEY R. SHEGERIAN

1/14/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CARRNEY R. SHEGERIAN

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS

1/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (EVIDENTIARY HEARING)...)

1/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (EVIDENTIARY HEARING)...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/15/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF FIONA TRINITYS NOTICE OF FILING REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT OF JANUARY 15, 2021 EVIDENTIARY HEARING

2/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF FIONA TRINITYS NOTICE OF FILING REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT OF JANUARY 15, 2021 EVIDENTIARY HEARING

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF FIONA TRINITYS CLOSING ARGUMENT BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF CARNEY R. SHEGERIAN; EXHIBIT

2/16/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF FIONA TRINITYS CLOSING ARGUMENT BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF CARNEY R. SHEGERIAN; EXHIBIT

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS' POST-EVIDENTIARY HEARING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

2/16/2021: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS' POST-EVIDENTIARY HEARING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT S. BLUMBERG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' POST-EVIDENTIARY HEARING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

2/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROBERT S. BLUMBERG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' POST-EVIDENTIARY HEARING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Status Conference (re Appeal) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re Appeal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Status Conference (re Appeal) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re Appeal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Carney R. Shegerian (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Status Conference (re Appeal) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference re Appeal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Fiona Trinity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Fiona Trinity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Fiona Trinity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Fiona Trinity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Fiona Trinity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fiona Trinity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fiona Trinity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fiona Trinity (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0051    Hearing Date: August 10, 2020    Dept: 74

*******0051 FIONA TRINITY vs LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant’s Motion to Compel Arbitration

TENTATIVE RULING: The hearing on defendant’s motion to compel arbitration will be CONTINUED for an evidentiary hearing. While procedurally and substantively insufficient, Defendant’s request for a statement of decision is an admission there are disputed facts material to the determination of this motion. See Rosenthal v. Great W. Fin. Sec. Corp. (1996) 14 Cal. 4th 394; Wagner Constr. Co. v. Pac. Mech. Corp. (2007) 41 Cal. 4th 19.