Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 20:01:40 (UTC).

FIONA SHEEHY VS JENNIFER HAYDEN

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 FIONA SHEEHY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JENNIFER HAYDEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0516

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEEHY FIONA

Defendant

HAYDEN JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARAJAS RAYMOND

STONE JASON M.

Defendant Attorneys

BOESCH PHILIP WENDEL

JACKSON LARRY ROSS

 

Court Documents

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/21/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • Hearing09/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Hearing06/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Jennifer Hayden (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Fiona Sheehy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Fiona Sheehy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Fiona Sheehy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAJAS RAYMOND

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE JASON M.