Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 06:49:34 (UTC).

FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST BY AND THROUGH ITS SERVICER BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COM VS WEIZLAB, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST BY AND THROUGH ITS SERVICER BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEIZLAB, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0157

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST BY AND THROUGH ITS SERVICER BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS ADMINISTERED BY ITS ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS FINANCIAL SERVICES DIVISION

Defendants

WEI ZHAOKAI AKA KAI ZHAO WEI

WEIZLAB INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CALEY REBECCA

 

Court Documents

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

4/1/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

4/1/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

4/1/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

4/1/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/1/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/1/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/26/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/1/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/1/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • Hearing07/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Hearing07/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department J at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Financial Services Vehicle Trust by and through its servicer BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company as administered by its Rolls-Royce Motor Cars Financial Services Division (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Financial Services Vehicle Trust by and through its servicer BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company as administered by its Rolls-Royce Motor Cars Financial Services Division (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Financial Services Vehicle Trust by and through its servicer BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company as administered by its Rolls-Royce Motor Cars Financial Services Division (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALEY REBECCA