Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 18:29:34 (UTC).

FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, BY AND THROUGH ITS SERVICER, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY C VS PLATINUM PERSONAL BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LLC AKA PLATINUM PERSONAL & BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC, A DISSOLVED NORTH CAROLINA LIMI

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, BY AND THROUGH ITS SERVICER, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PLATINUM PERSONAL BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LLC AKA PLATINUM PERSONAL BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC, A DISSOLVED NORTH CAROLINA LIMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0246

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST BY AND THROUGH ITS SERVICER BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS ADMINISTERED BY ITS ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS FINANCIAL SERVICES DIVISION

Defendants

PLATINUM PERSONAL BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LLC AKA PLATINUM PERSONAL & BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LLC A DISSOLVED NORTH CAROLINA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PERKINS ALVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALEY REBECCA

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/1/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

4/1/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

4/1/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

4/1/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/1/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

4/1/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/30/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, as administered by its ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS FINANCIAL SERVICES Division (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, as administered by its ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS FINANCIAL SERVICES Division (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, as administered by its ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS FINANCIAL SERVICES Division (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALEY REBECCA