Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 01:07:26 (UTC).

FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, BY AND THROUGH ITS SERVICER, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY C VS OUSSAMA CHAABANE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, BY AND THROUGH ITS SERVICER, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OUSSAMA CHAABANE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0359

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST BY AND THROUGH ITS SERVICER BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ NATALIE D

CHAABANE OUSSAMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CALEY REBECCA

CALEY REBECCA ANNE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

4/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/15/2020: Case Management Statement

Application for Publication

10/15/2020: Application for Publication

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION

10/15/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION

Order for Publication

10/19/2020: Order for Publication

Proof of Service by Mail

8/24/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER M. DOMIN

8/18/2020: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER M. DOMIN

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/19/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

8/19/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • Hearing08/27/2021 at 13:30 PM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Hearing08/27/2021 at 13:30 PM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference); Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Continuance of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service Pursuant to Declaration of Christopher M. Domin; Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Declaration of Christopher M. Domin re Order t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Christopher M. Domin re Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Request for Continuance and Order Thereon); Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FINANCIAL SERVICES VEHICLE TRUST, by and through its servicer, BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALEY REBECCA