Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 07:20:29 (UTC).

FILM FINANCES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ALFRED PRODUCTIONS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 FILM FINANCES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ALFRED PRODUCTIONS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0902

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FILM FINANCES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FILM FINANCES INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HANMI BANK A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LUESSENHOP JOHN

BLUE RIDER SAN JUAN LLC A PUERTO RICO CORPORATION

DEL CASTRO RICHARD RIONDA

SPEED KILLS PRODUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ALFRED PRODUCTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HANNIBAL INC. DBA HANNIBAL PICTURES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BLUE RIDER SAN JUAN LLC

SPEED KILLS PRODUCTION INC.

ALFRED PRODUCTIONS INC.

HANMI BANK

HANNIBAL INC. DBA HANNIBAL PICTURES INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DEL CASTRO RICHARD RIONDA

BLUE RIDER SAN JUAN LLC

SPEED KILLS PRODUCTION INC.

HANMI BANK

HANNIBAL INC.

Not Classified By Court

GRACE COLLINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GANS GARY E

GANS GARY E.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HAMRICK A. RAYMOND

BENSAMOCHAN ERIC

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON ERIC

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

4/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

12/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/03/2021

3/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/03/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, ALFRED PRODUCTIONS, INC. AND ALFRED JOH...)

3/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, ALFRED PRODUCTIONS, INC. AND ALFRED JOH...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY E. GANS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF IN INTERPLEADER FILM FINANCES, INC.S APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

3/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY E. GANS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF IN INTERPLEADER FILM FINANCES, INC.S APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2021

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2021

Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO SET ASIDE ORDER TO DISCHARGE PLAINTIFF FILM FINANCES, INC. FROM INTERPLEADER ACTION

12/4/2020: Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO SET ASIDE ORDER TO DISCHARGE PLAINTIFF FILM FINANCES, INC. FROM INTERPLEADER ACTION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF A. RAYMOND HAMRICK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPEED KILLS PRODUCTION, INC., HANNIBAL MEDIA INC., AND RICHARD RIONDA DEL CASTROS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO B

12/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF A. RAYMOND HAMRICK IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPEED KILLS PRODUCTION, INC., HANNIBAL MEDIA INC., AND RICHARD RIONDA DEL CASTROS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO B

Notice of Appearance

12/4/2020: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service by Mail

8/2/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

8/2/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING REGARDIG PROPOSED ORDER T...)

6/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING REGARDIG PROPOSED ORDER T...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY E. GANS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF FILM FINANCES INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/3/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY E. GANS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF FILM FINANCES INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR STAY OF ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

6/14/2019: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/17/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice - NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN FUNDS

4/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST IN FUNDS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • Hearing06/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Film Finances, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 07:04 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion to set aside order of discharge) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default as to Cross-Defendant Hanmi Bank) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Cross-Defendant Blue Rider San Juan, LLC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Film Finances, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Film Finances, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Film Finances, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Film Finances, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Disclaimer of Interest in Funds); Filed by Film Finances, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Film Finances, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Film Finances, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Film Finances, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANNIBAL INC. DBA HANNIBAL PICTURES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Film Finances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Speed Kills Production, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hanmi Bank is a litigant